EP0108717 - Apparatus for cleaning sewage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/20] | Grate for cleaning sewage | ||
[1986/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuchs Maschinenbau Oberebenestrasse 1 CH-5620 Bremgarten / CH | [1984/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Heinrich Oberebenestrasse 1 CH-5620 Bremgarten / CH | 02 /
Fuchs, Jürg Kapuzinerhügel 11 CH-5620 Bremgarten / CH | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Mellingerstrasse 1 CH-5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Mellingerstrasse 1 CH-5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810485.9 | 21.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | CH19820006438 | 05.11.1982 Original published format: CH 643882 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108717 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108717 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108717 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/14, B01D33/04 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
E02B8/026 (EP);
B01D33/04 (EP);
B01D33/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Abwasser | [1986/41] | English: | Apparatus for cleaning sewage | [1986/41] | French: | Dispositif pour nettoyer des eaux usées | [1986/41] |
Former [1984/20] | Rechen zur Reinigung von Abwasser | ||
Former [1984/20] | Grate for cleaning sewage | ||
Former [1984/20] | Grille pour nettoyer des eaux usées | Examination procedure | 16.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 02.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1250409 [ ]; | DE801626 [ ] (SCHAEFER FRANZ); | FR1090784 [ ] (RIOMILEX); | FR1352960 [ ]; | FR1554213 [ ]; | FR2285935 [ ] (PENARROYA MINIERE METALL [FR]) |