Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
05.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] |
26.08.1986 | Change - first examination report | published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] |
28.02.1986 | First examination report | |
07.07.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |
07.07.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |