EP0109363 - A bolting system for doors, windows and the like with blocking members automatically slided from the door frame into the wing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/21] | A block system for doors, windows and the like with blocking members automatically slided from the door frame into the wing | ||
[1986/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fedeli, Benedetto 36 Via Bolognola I-00138 Rome / IT | [1984/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Gristina, Giorgio Studio Rag. GRISTINA Giorgio, Via delle Quattro Fontane, 29 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Gristina, Giorgio Studio Rag. GRISTINA Giorgio, Via delle Quattro Fontane, 29 I-00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830034.1 | 10.02.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | IT19820049487 | 15.11.1982 Original published format: IT 4948782 | IT19830047604 | 25.01.1983 Original published format: IT 4760483 | [1984/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109363 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109363 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109363 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/00, E05C19/00, E06B7/18 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
E05C19/001 (EP,US);
E06B5/113 (EP,US);
E05B63/0052 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/21] | E05C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/21] | Title | German: | Verriegelungssystem für Türen, Fenster und dergleichen mit automatisch vom Türrahmen in den Flügel gleitenden Blockierungsgliedern | [1984/21] | English: | A bolting system for doors, windows and the like with blocking members automatically slided from the door frame into the wing | [1986/52] | French: | Système de blocage pour portes, fenêtres et similaires avec des membres glissant automatiquement du cadre de porte dans le battant | [1984/21] |
Former [1984/21] | A block system for doors, windows and the like with blocking members automatically slided from the door frame into the wing | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 04.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT185264B (SCHWARZACHER WOLFGANG DIPL ING); | [A]DE1659852 (FUCHS OTTO METALLWERKE); | [A]DE2219300 ; | [A]DE2616422 |