EP0089319 - Method for the production of synthetic calcium-vanadium ferrimagnetic garnets with improved hysteresis characteristics in temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/38] | Synthetic calcium-vanadium ferromagnetic garnets with improved hysteresis characteristics in temperature | ||
[1987/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1988 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1988 [1988/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SELENIA INDUSTRIE ELETTRONICHE ASSOCIATE S.p.A. Via Tiburtina, KM 12.400 I-00131 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states SELENIA INDUSTRIE ELETTRONICHE ASSOCIATE S.p.A. Via Tiburtina, KM 12.400 I-00131 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Gregorio, Carlo, Dr. Viale I. Maggio 110 I-00046 Grottaferrata (Roma) / IT | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Gustorf Bachstrasse 6 A D-84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 83830042.4 | 25.02.1983 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | IT19820047968 | 11.03.1982 Original published format: IT 4796882 | [1983/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089319 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0089319 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/34, H01F10/24, C04B35/26 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
C04B35/2641 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung Synthetischer Calcium-Vanadium ferrimagnetischer Granate mit verbesserter temperaturabhóngiger Hysteresekennlinie | [1987/23] | English: | Method for the production of synthetic calcium-vanadium ferrimagnetic garnets with improved hysteresis characteristics in temperature | [1987/23] | French: | Procédé de préparation de grenats synthétiques ferrimagnétiques à calcium-vanadium avec caractéristiques perfectionnées d'hystérésis dépendant de la température | [1987/23] |
Former [1983/38] | Synthetischer Calcium-Vanadium ferromagnetischer Granat mit verbesserter temperaturabhängiger Hysteresekennlinie | ||
Former [1983/38] | Synthetic calcium-vanadium ferromagnetic garnets with improved hysteresis characteristics in temperature | ||
Former [1983/38] | Grenats synthétiques ferromagnétiques à calcium-vanadium avec caractéristiques perfectionnées d'hystérésis dépendant de la température | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/22] | 09.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21] | Request for further processing for: | 22.02.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP5519888 [ ]; | JP5526604 [ ]; | DE2637380 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | DE2745266 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | US4213803 [ ] (HORI TETSUO [JP], et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, Efield, vol. 4, no. 48 (E-6)(530), April 12, 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 142 E 6 & JP-A-55-19 888, JP-A-55-19-889 (HITACHI), & JP5519888 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E field, vol. 4, no. 56 (E-8)(538), April 25, 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT pages 70 E 8 & JP-A-55-26 604 (hitachi), & JP5526604 A 00000000 |