EP0112301 - Device and process for the recovery of submerged bodies, particularly anchors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.1985 [1985/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibba, Giuseppe Via Giovanni XXIII, 137 I-07041 Alghero (Sassari) / IT | [1984/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19 I-40121 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830210.7 | 25.10.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | IT19820003624 | 17.12.1982 Original published format: IT 362482 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112301 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112301 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/22 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
B63B21/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bergen von Unterwasserkörpern insbesondere von Ankern | [1984/26] | English: | Device and process for the recovery of submerged bodies, particularly anchors | [1984/26] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour remonter des objets submergés en particulier des ancres | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/47] | 11.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4067287 [ ] (SABELLA DOMINICK A); | US4161922 [ ] (FOGG FRANCIS [US]) |