Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0112307
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
13.06.1990 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] |
20.03.1990 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] |
01.02.1990 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |
10.06.1989 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] |
31.05.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] |
24.03.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] |
12.02.1987 |
First examination report |
|
21.01.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |
07.02.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] |
28.04.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.06.1984 [1984/26] |