EP0112307 - A tracheal intubation cannula with external valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavalli, Walter Via dell'Artigiano, 11 I-40055 Villanova di Castenaso (Bologna) / IT | For all designated states Rangoni, Marco Via delle Frangole, 45 Bologna / IT | For all designated states Cavalli, Dante Via dell'Artigiano, 9 I-40055 Villanova di Castenaso (Bologna) / IT | For all designated states Rangoni, Roberto Via Venezia, 20 S. Lazzaro di Savena (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states Cavalli, Walter Via dell'Artigiano, 11 I-40055 Villanova di Castenaso (Bologna) / IT | ||
For all designated states Rangoni, Marco Via delle Frangole, 45 Bologna / IT | |||
For all designated states Cavalli, Dante Via dell'Artigiano, 9 I-40055 Villanova di Castenaso (Bologna) / IT | |||
For all designated states Rangoni, Roberto Via Venezia, 20 S. Lazzaro di Savena (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Pozzoli, Giuliano e/o ENGIMPEX S.A. Industrial Property Services Dept. P.O. Box 12 CH-6924 Lugano-Sorengo / CH | [1988/29] |
Former [1988/19] | Pozzoli, Giuliano e/o ENGIMPEX S.A. Engineering Consultants & Industrial Management P.O. Box 18 CH-6902 Lugano-Paradiso / CH | ||
Former [1984/26] | Trentini, Ermanno Studio Brevetti Internazionali Ing. E. Trentini Via U. Lenzi, 2 I-40122 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830264.4 | 12.12.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | IT19820003631 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: IT 363182 | [1984/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112307 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112307 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112307 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
A61M16/0468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Trachealintubationskanüle mit externem Ventil | [1984/26] | English: | A tracheal intubation cannula with external valve | [1984/26] | French: | Canule d'intubation trachéale avec valve externe | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.1989 | NL | 26.07.1989 | SE | 26.07.1989 | [2002/23] |
Former [1990/19] | AT | 26.07.1989 | |
NL | 26.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 26.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2039142 (BREHM WILLIAM F); | [A]DE1852111U (KOEHLER RUDOLF [DE]); | [A]US3137299 (TABOR CARL J); | [A]CH408292 (NEUENSCHWANDER RENE [CH]); | [A]US3827440 (BIRCH A, et al); | [A]US3924637 (SWANSON ARTHUR H); | [A]DE2505123 (TRACOE MEDIZINE GES FUER); | [X]US4223411 (SCHOENDORFER DONALD W, et al); | [X]US4325366 (TABOR CARL J); | [XP]EP0078685 (HANSA MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) |