EP0088058 - A method and installation for filtration of liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Backman, Sune Yngvevägen 6 S-182 64 Djursholm / SE | For all designated states Hakanson, Hakan Strakvägen 54 S-183 40 Täby / SE | [1983/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Nordén, J. Ake, et al Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Nordén, Ake, et al Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB Box 19540 S-104 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83850024.7 | 02.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | SE19820001179 | 25.02.1982 Original published format: SE 8201179 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088058 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088058 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/18 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Filtrieren von Flüssigkeiten | [1983/36] | English: | A method and installation for filtration of liquid | [1983/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la filtration de liquides | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 03.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/27] | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1511844 (NUOVA MODERNA S N C DI ZERBINI); | [Y]US3285420 (JACQUES MULLER); | [A]FR2353325 (BARIL FERNAND [FR]); | [A]US4292178 (MORI TAKEHIKO, et al); | [XP]EP0057670 (DOUCET CHARLES); | [A]FR1543176 |