EP0113330 - Acylated enamide compounds, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and use of these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTEC (Société Anonyme) Avenue Louise, 479 (bte 47) B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1984/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viehe, Heinz Clos du Paradis, 7 Grand Manil B-1350 Limal / BE | 02 /
Hervens, Françoise Leuvensebaan, 354 B-3051 Sint-Agatha-Rode / BE | 03 /
Roberfroid, Marcel 6, Place des Giroflées B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al p.a. Freylinger & Associés 22 avenue J.S. Bach (bte 43) B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al p.a. Freylinger & Associés 22 avenue J.S. Bach (bte 43) B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 83870139.9 | 20.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | FR19820021965 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: FR 8221965 | [1984/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113330 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113330 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/84, A61K31/195, // (A61K31/195, 31:675),(A61K31/195, 31:70) | [1984/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K31/195 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K31/195 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/36] |
Former [1984/28] | IT | Title | German: | Acylierte Enamidverbindungen, diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen und Verwendung dieser Verbindungen | [1984/28] | English: | Acylated enamide compounds, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and use of these compounds | [1984/28] | French: | Composés énamides acylés, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant, utilisation de ces composés et procédé de préparation de ces composés | [1984/28] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1986/35: Verbunden mit 84900016.1/0161249 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 14.07.86 | EPB 1986/35: Consolidated with 84900016.1/0161249 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 14.07.86 | EPB 1986/35: Jointe à la demande no. 84900016.1/0161249 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 14.07.86 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 04.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 03.09.1986 | Appeal received No. J0001/87 | 12.11.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.1987 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1987/10] | 24.04.1987 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1987/17] | 24.06.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2449191 [ ] (BEHRENS OTTO K); | DE2201478 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) | [ ] - SYNTHESIS, no. 7, juillet 1977 | Examination | - SYNTHESIS, no. 7, juillet 1977 A.J. KOLAR et al.: "A convenient, Large-Scale Preparation of 2-Acetamidoacrylic Acid and its Methyl Ester", pages 457-459. |