blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0087407

EP0087407 - Antiskid device for vehicle wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.1985
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.1985Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.1986 [1986/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hulek, Dipl.-Ing., Anton
Goglerfeldgasse 15
A-4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [1983/35]For all designated states
Hulek, Anton, Dipl.-Ing.
Goglerfeldgasse 15
A-4020 Linz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1983/35]
Representative(s)Noske, Wolfgang
Hamerlinggasse 19
2340 Mödling / AT
[N/P]
Former [1983/35]Noske, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Hamerlinggasse 19
A-2340 Mödling / AT
Application number, filing date83890024.921.02.1983
[1983/35]
Priority number, dateAT1982000064919.02.1982         Original published format: AT 64982
[1983/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0087407
Date:31.08.1983
Language:DE
[1983/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1983
ClassificationIPC:B60C27/10
[1983/35]
CPC:
B60C27/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1983/35]
TitleGerman:Gleitschutzeinrichtung für Luftreifen[1983/35]
English:Antiskid device for vehicle wheels[1983/35]
French:Dispositif antidérapant pour pneumatiques[1983/35]
File destroyed:13.07.1991
Examination procedure21.02.1984Examination requested  [1984/18]
02.09.1985Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1986/08]
25.09.1985Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1986/08]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.198503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3487869  ;
 [A]CH207950  ;
 [A]US3884283  ;
 [A]DE2122009
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.