EP0121644 - Cable entry insertion piece for cable sleeves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laha, Manfred Grosse Stadtgutgasse 18 A-1020 Wien II / AT | [1984/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Krause, Ernst, et al Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing P.O. Box 234 Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien VI / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing P.O. Box 234 Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien VI / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890052.0 | 05.04.1983 | [1984/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121644 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/013, H02G15/10 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
H02G15/10 (EP);
H02G15/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Kabeleinführungseinsatz für Kabelmuffen | [1984/42] | English: | Cable entry insertion piece for cable sleeves | [1984/42] | French: | Pièce d'insertion pour l'entrée de câbles pour manchons de câbles | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/01] | 16.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.04.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2125264 [ ]; | US2800526 [ ]; | US2225472 [ ]; | US3167374 [ ]; | GB557328 [ ]; | DE1765066 [ ] | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 13, Nr. 13, M{rz 1971, Seiten 3144-3145, New YorkUSA |