EP0102938 - Friction wheel gearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1986 [1986/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maichen, Karl Thaläckerstrasse 12 A-6923 Lauterach / AT | [1984/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 A-1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890092.6 | 01.06.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | AT19820002219 | 08.06.1982 Original published format: AT 221982 | AT19830001798 | 16.05.1983 Original published format: AT 179883 | [1984/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102938 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102938 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/42 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
B62M11/12 (EP);
F16H15/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Reibradgetriebe | [1984/11] | English: | Friction wheel gearing | [1984/11] | French: | Transmission à roue à friction | [1984/11] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/44] | 27.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH261184 [ ] (DABO AG [CH]); | FR869938 [ ] (WESSELMANN BOHRER CO AG); | GB1204658 [ ] (STEINFELS HELMUT [DE]); | DE107562 [ ]; | US664028 [ ] (RYD GUSTAF ADOLF [SE]); | DE1650790 [ ] (NAT RES DEV); | DE1953496 [ ] (SCHAEFER GUENTHER); | GB861952 [ ] (GARRETT CORP); | US2325323 [ ] (JOHNSON CARL E, et al); | US2336799 [ ] (PALM BERNHARD N) |