EP0108742 - Land mine, in particular an anti-tank mine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vonderhaid, Oskar Bleriotstrasse 21/2/16 A-1110 Wien / AT | [1984/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vonderhaid, Oskar Bleriotstrasse 21/2/16 A-1110 wien / AT | 02 /
Vonderhaid, Harald Bleriotstrasse 21/2/16 A-1110 Wien / AT | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Klein, Adam Patentanwälte Klein & Pinter OEG Fasangasse 49 A-1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Klein, Adam, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte Klein & Pinter OEG Fasangasse 49 A-1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890178.3 | 10.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | AT19820003746 | 11.10.1982 Original published format: AT 374682 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108742 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108742 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F42B23/28, F42B23/04 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
F42C14/08 (EP);
F42C7/06 (EP);
F42C9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Landmine, insbesondere zur Panzerabwehr | [1984/20] | English: | Land mine, in particular an anti-tank mine | [1984/20] | French: | Mine terrestre, notamment mine antichar | [1984/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 29.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.02.1987 | FR | 04.02.1987 | IT | 04.02.1987 | NL | 04.02.1987 | SE | 28.02.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.02.1987 | |
IT | 04.02.1987 | ||
NL | 04.02.1987 | ||
SE | 28.02.1987 | ||
Former [1989/17] | BE | 04.02.1987 | |
NL | 04.02.1987 | ||
SE | 28.02.1987 | ||
Former [1988/43] | BE | 04.02.1987 | |
NL | 04.02.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 04.02.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | DE959257 [ ]; | DE1199665 [ ]; | CH634406 [ ]; | FR2393261 [ ] | Examination | FR82801E |