EP0108745 - Supporting arrangement for containers and removable superstructures for trucks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1989 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofstetter, Michael Unterrohr 93 A-4532 Rohr/Kremstal / AT | [1984/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890195.7 | 02.11.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | AT19820004003 | 03.11.1982 Original published format: AT 400382 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108745 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108745 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108745 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/14, B60P1/64 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
B65D90/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Abstützvorrichtung für Container und Wechselaufbauten von Lastfahrzeugen | [1984/20] | English: | Supporting arrangement for containers and removable superstructures for trucks | [1984/20] | French: | Dispositif de support pour conteneurs et superstructures amovibles de camions | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 15.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/14] | Request for further processing for: | 20.08.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3332661 ; | [A]US2958538 ; | [A]FR2380915 ; | [A]EP0025557 ; | [A]CH579470 ; | [A]GB820391 |