EP0114593 - Process for the production of a hollow cylinder for synthetics processing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEREINIGTE EDELSTAHLWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states VEREINIGTE EDELSTAHLWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gstettner, Manfred Redfeldgasse 16 A-8605 Kapfenberg / AT | 02 /
Hribernik, Bruno, Dipl.-Ing. Schöberlhof 5 A-8605 Kapfenberg / AT | 03 /
Kohnhauser, Alexander Stubenberggasse 14 A-8605 Kapfenberg / AT | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Widtmann, Georg Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke AG (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Widtmann, Georg, Dr. Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke Aktiengesellschaft (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890234.4 | 22.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | AT19820004679 | 23.12.1982 Original published format: AT 467982 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114593 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B22F7/04, B21D31/00, B22F3/14, B32B15/16, B23K20/00 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
B22F3/1208 (EP,US);
B22F7/062 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
F41A21/02 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12097 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F7/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Maschinenhohlzylinders für Kunststoffverarbeitungsmaschinen | [1984/31] | English: | Process for the production of a hollow cylinder for synthetics processing machines | [1984/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un cylindre creux pour machines de transformation des plastiques | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 07.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 25.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 04.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3753704 [ ] (MANILLA C, et al); | DE2504032 [ ] (NIPPON MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS MFG); | DE2514565 [ ] (URALSKY NII TRUBNOJ PROMY); | DE2855155 [ ] (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | DE3114659 [ ] (CAMERON IRON WORKS INC [US]); | US4327154 [ ] (ROSSMANN AXEL) |