EP0115758 - Port-controlled two-stroke internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1985 [1985/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rabl, Alfred Beethovengasse 21 2340 Mödling / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states Rabl, Alfred Beethovengasse 21 A-2340 Mödling / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 A-1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890236.9 | 28.12.1983 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | AT19830000045 | 07.01.1983 Original published format: AT 4583 | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115758 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02B25/20, F02B25/22 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
F02B25/20 (EP);
F02B25/22 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Schlitzgesteuerte Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine | [1984/33] | English: | Port-controlled two-stroke internal combustion engine | [1984/33] | French: | Moteur à deux temps commandé par lumières | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/45] | 22.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2621628 [ ]; | DE1042286 [ ]; | DE2943496 [ ]; | DE748415 [ ]; | GB2115485 [ ] |