EP0097721 - VERTICAL BALANCE TESTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Masaki 20-4-306, Higashinakafuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu 573 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Kenji 24-1-405, Miiminami-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu 572 / JP | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83900064.3 | 20.12.1982 | [1984/02] | WO1982JP00473 | Priority number, date | JP19810207642 | 21.12.1981 Original published format: JP 20764281 | [1984/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302325 | Date: | 07.07.1983 | [1983/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097721 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/16 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G01M1/06 (EP);
G01M1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/02] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM TESTEN DES SENKRECHTEN GLEICHGEWICHTS | [1984/02] | English: | VERTICAL BALANCE TESTING MACHINE | [1984/02] | French: | MACHINE DE TEST D'EQUILIBRAGE VERTICAL | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 03.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1983 | Translation filed | 22.08.1983 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1983 | Search fee paid | 22.08.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/02] | 12.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/22] | 30.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2177956 ; | [X]US3805623 ; | [X]FR1201955 | International search | JPS392194B [ ]; | DE1698164 [ ]; | JPS578430 [ ]; | DE2411843 [ ] | [Y] - National Technical Report, Vol. 23, No. 3,(1977) UMEZAWA NORIO and one other, "Wheel Balancer yo Dendoki", p. 492 - 505especially see p. 501-504 |