Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] |
19.12.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |
18.11.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.01.1984 [1984/03] |
16.09.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.11.1983 [1983/46] |