EP0098874 - IMPROVEMENT OF MOTION PICTURE IMAGE QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLAKE, Larry 8 Spinnaker Lane New Orleans LA 70124 / US | [1984/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/04] | Application number, filing date | 83900597.2 | 10.01.1983 | [1984/04] | WO1983US00037 | Priority number, date | US19820339664 | 15.01.1982 Original published format: US 339664 | US19820451493 | 20.12.1982 Original published format: US 451493 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302502 | Date: | 21.07.1983 | [1983/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098874 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G03B19/18, G03C1/76 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
G03B37/06 (EP);
G03C5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1984/04] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER QUALITÄT EINES KINEMATOGRAPHISCHEN BILDES | [1984/04] | English: | IMPROVEMENT OF MOTION PICTURE IMAGE QUALITY | [1984/04] | French: | AMELIORATION DE LA QUALITE DE L'IMAGE CINEMATOGRAPHIQUE | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/27] | 18.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.1984 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3396021 ; | [Y]US3143033 ; | [Y]US4183633 ; | [Y]US1966503 ; | [Y]US1032172 ; | [Y]US3165969 ; | [Y]US3046832 ; | [A]US3865738 |