EP0104204 - CAST SOLDER LEADS FOR LEADLESS SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1984/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, John Robb, JR. 6-30 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 83901043.6 | 18.02.1983 | [1984/14] | WO1983US00222 | Priority number, date | US19820358412 | 15.03.1982 Original published format: US 358412 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303216 | Date: | 29.09.1983 | [1983/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0104204 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104204 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23K31/02, H01L21/60 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/67138 (EP,US);
B23K3/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US);
H05K3/3468 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10378 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10424 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10727 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0113 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0338 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0405 (EP,US);
H05K2203/041 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0415 (EP,US);
H05K2203/043 (EP,US);
H05K2203/128 (EP,US);
H05K3/3442 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49149 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49204 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49222 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1984/14] | Title | German: | GEGOSSENE LÖTBARE LEITER FÜR LEITERLOSE HALBLEITERSTROMKREISE | [1984/14] | English: | CAST SOLDER LEADS FOR LEADLESS SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUITS | [1984/14] | French: | CONDUCTEURS COULES EN PRODUIT A SOUDER POUR CIRCUITS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DEPOURVUS DE CONDUCTEURS | [1984/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1983 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1983 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0040905 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2001142 (BUNKER RAMO); | [A]US3193789 (BROWN WILLIAM C) | International search | [A]US3171175 (CURCIO RINALDO M); | [Y]US3864827 (SCHREINER HORST, et al); | [AP]US4352449 (HALL PETER M, et al); | [A]SU831318 (INST LITYA AN USSR [SU]) | [A] - Conference: Proceedings of the 31st Electronic Components, P.M. HALL, Solder Post Attachment of Ceramic Chip Carriers |