EP0106869 - LOW TEMPERATURE STAGE FOR MICROANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Glasgow, University Court The University Glasgow G12 8QQ Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states The University of Glasgow, University Court The University Glasgow G12 8QQ, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLSON, Walter Anthony Patrick 52 South Mains Road Milngavie / GB | 02 /
BIDDLECOMBE, William Harry 25 Bathgo Avenue Ralston / GB | 03 /
ELDER, Hugh Young 115 Ravelstone Road Bearsden Glasgow G61 / GB | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1984/18] | Wotherspoon, Graham FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 83901328.1 | 19.04.1983 | [1984/18] | WO1983GB00115 | Priority number, date | GB19820011341 | 20.04.1982 Original published format: GB 8211341 | [1984/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303707 | Date: | 27.10.1983 | [1983/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106869 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106869 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
H01J37/20 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/18] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGTEMPERATURPROBEBÜHNE FÜR MIKROANALYSE | [1984/18] | English: | LOW TEMPERATURE STAGE FOR MICROANALYSIS | [1984/18] | French: | ETAGE A FAIBLE TEMPERATURE POUR MICRO-ANALYSES | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1983 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 22.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Request for further processing for: | 18.09.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 18.09.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3958124 (KOCH GEORGE R, et al); | [A]GB2000901 (JEOL LTD); | [A]US4162401 (KING WAYNE E [US], et al) | [A] - Journal of Physics E - Scientific Instruments, Volume 15, No. 2, February 1982, Dorking (GB) J.A. EADES: "A Helium Cooled Specimen Stage for Electron Microscopy" pages 184-186, see parapraph 2, entitled "the stage" |