EP0124527 - GELATIN BASED SYNTHETIC WHOLE BLOOD AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHETIC BLOOD CORPORATION 725 County Line Road Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [1987/52] |
Former [1984/46] | For all designated states NEOMED CORPORATION 540 Hunter Court Wilmette Illinois 60091 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECANOW, Charles, S. 4118 Skokiana Terrace Skokie, IL 60076 / US | 02 /
ECANOW, Bernard 540 Hunter Court Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | [1984/46] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/46] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83901693.8 | 16.05.1983 | [1984/46] | WO1983US00739 | Priority number, date | US19820437823 | 29.10.1982 Original published format: US 437823 | US19830464704 | 07.02.1983 Original published format: US 464704 | [1984/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401717 | Date: | 10.05.1984 | [1984/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0124527 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124527 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K37/12, A61K37/14 | [1984/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/0026 (EP,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/42 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0471 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/46] | Title | German: | GELATINBASIERTER VOLLSTÄNDIGER BLUTERSATZ UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1984/46] | English: | GELATIN BASED SYNTHETIC WHOLE BLOOD AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [1984/46] | French: | SANG ENTIER SYNTHETIQUE A BASE DE GELATINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1984/46] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 04.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86107262.7 / EP0223906 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB742594 (CHARLES B KNOX GELATINE COMPAN); | [A]US4001401 (BONSEN PIETER, et al); | [A]DE2940184 (BIOTEST SERUM INSTITUT GMBH [DE]) | Examination | US3169004 | US4002739 | US4252793 | US4343797 | - Science, 27 May 1983, pp. 965-967 | - The Journal of Physical Chemistry, 64 (1), Sept. 1960, A. Veis et al., pp. 1203-1210 | - Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, June 1982, 71(6), J.N. McNullen et al., pp. 628-633 |