Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0124527
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.06.1988 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] |
16.02.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.04.1988 [1988/14] |
05.11.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] |
05.11.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] |
10.08.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.09.1987 [1987/40] |
27.06.1987 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] |
01.07.1986 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] |
08.11.1984 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.01.1985 [1985/02] |
14.09.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.11.1984 [1984/46] |