Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0223906 | Global Dossier | 01.02.1989 | A3 | EP0223906 | 03.06.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP86107262 | 16.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE28795T | 15.08.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US8300739 | 16.05.1983 | EP83901693 | 16.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1224145 | 14.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CA503072 | 28.02.1986 | CA428347 | 17.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3372915D1 | 17.09.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US8300739 | 16.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59501948 | 22.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US8300739 | 16.05.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO162367B | 11.09.1989 | B | NO842632L | 29.06.1984 | L | Priority number | Date | US8300739 | 16.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO874920D0 | 26.11.1987 | D0 | NO874920L | 29.06.1984 | L | Priority number | Date | US8300739 | 16.05.1983 | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | NO874920 | 26.11.1987 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | NO842632 | 29.06.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4596788 | 24.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US61795984 | 07.06.1984 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8401717 | Global Dossier | 10.05.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU564308B | Global Dossier | 06.08.1987 | B2 | AU1554583 | 22.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0124527 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1987 | B1 | EP0124527 | 14.11.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1206093 | 17.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL68744 | 31.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1228589 | 24.06.1991 | B | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4539204 | 03.09.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US43782382 | 29.10.1982 | US46470483 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Divisional application | EP0223906 |