Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] |
07.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] |
19.02.1987 | Correction of patent specification | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] |
29.08.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] |
26.06.1984 | Change - representative | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] |
01.06.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
04.05.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] |