EP0107734 - ISONITRILE RADIONUCLIDE COMPLEXES FOR LABELLING AND IMAGING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE University Place, 4th floor South, 124 Mt. Aubern Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | ||
For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Alun G. 50 Manemet Road Newton Centre, MA 02159 / US | 02 /
DAVISON, Alan 30 Tillotson Road Needham, MA 02194 / US | 03 /
ABRAMS, Michael J. 74 Brainerd Road Allston, MA 02134 / US | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Schwabe, Hans-Georg, et al Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [1985/42] | Schwabe, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1984/19] | Berg, Wilhelm, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83902147.4 | 26.04.1983 | [1984/19] | WO1983US00638 | Priority number, date | US19820373511 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: US 373511 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303761 | Date: | 10.11.1983 | [1983/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107734 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107734 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K43/00, A61K49/00, C07F9/66, C07F9/90, C07C119/02 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
A61K51/025 (EP,US);
A61K51/1234 (EP,US);
C07C251/00 (EP,US);
C07F13/005 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/19] | A61K43/00, A61K49/00, C07F9/66, C07F9/90, C07C121/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/19] | Title | German: | ISONITRIL-RADIONUKLID-KOMPLEXE FÜR ETIKETTIERUNGS- UND BILDAGENZIEN | [1984/19] | English: | ISONITRILE RADIONUCLIDE COMPLEXES FOR LABELLING AND IMAGING AGENTS | [1984/19] | French: | COMPLEXES ISONITRILES DE RADIONUCLEIDES POUR AGENTS D'ETIQUETAGE ET MISE EN IMAGE | [1984/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1983 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1983 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/19] | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - JOURNAL OF LAB. COMP. RADIOPHARM. vol. 19, 1982, Symposium Abstracts, M.J. ABRAMS et al.: "The preparation of technetium (III) compounds in aqueous media", pages 1596-1597. | [ ] - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 22, no. 20, September 28, 1983, American Chemical Society, M.J. ABRAMS et al.: "Synthesis and characterization of hexakis(alkyl isocyanide) and hexakis(aryl isocyanide) complexes of technetium (I)", pages 2798-2800. | International search | [X] - Inorganic Chemistry, Vol. 16(5), 1981, TREICHEL et al, see pages 1167-1169. | [X] - Inorganic Chemistry, Vol. 20, 1981, SZALDA et al, see pages 3851-3857. | [X] - Inorganic Chemistry, Vol. 21, 1982, MIALKI et al, see pages 480-485. | [X] - Inorganic Chemistry, Vol. 13, 1974, DOONAN et al, see pages 921-927. | [A] - Inorganic Chemistry, Vol. 20, 1981, DAVISON et al, see pages 1629-1632. | [A] - Journal of Nuclear Medicine, Vol. 21, 1980, see pages 279-281. | [A] - Investigative Nuclear Medicine, Clinical Sciences, Vol. 19, 1978, see pages 483-487. | [A] - Journal of Nuclear Medicine, Vol. 21,1980, KASSIS et al, see pages 88-90. | Examination | US4017596 | US4197312 | US4338248 | US4363793 | - Journal of Nuclear Medicine, Vol. 21, 1980, Kassis et al, see pages 88-90. | - Science, Vol. 214, Deutsch, et al, 1981, see pages 85-86 | - Journal of Nuclear Medicine, Vol. 22, 1981, Deutsch et al, see pages 897-907. | - Journal of Nuclear Medicine, Vol. 17, 1975, Smith et al, see pages 126-132. |