EP0146546 - COLDWORKING METHOD AND LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR COLDWORKING OF HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1987 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICAI, Louis, Zeno 17633 Northeast 8th Place Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | 02 /
STARKEY, Val, Kent 14510 Southeast 42nd Place Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1985/27] | Hoijtink, Reinoud OCTROOIBUREAU ARNOLD & SIEDSMA Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 83902352.0 | 09.06.1983 | [1985/27] | WO1983US00910 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8404896 | Date: | 20.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0146546 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23P9/02, B24B39/02, C10M3/00, F16N7/12 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
B23P9/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/27] | Title | German: | KALTBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SCHMIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE KALTBEARBEITUNG VON LÖCHERN | [1985/27] | English: | COLDWORKING METHOD AND LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR COLDWORKING OF HOLES | [1985/27] | French: | PROCEDE D'USINAGE A FROID ET SYSTEME DE LUBRIFICATION POUR L'USINAGE A FROID DE TROUS | [1985/27] | File destroyed: | 10.05.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/27] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.1985 | 30.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB191418785 (HOLLANDS CHARLES LOUIS [GB]); | [A]US1934225 (CANDOR EDWARD R); | [A]FR1147410 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [A]CH347393 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH]); | [A]US3805578 (KING J); | [A]US3892121 (CHAMPOUX LOUIS A, et al); | [A]US4243079 (DANIELS NICHOLAS R) | [A] - Machine Design, Vol. 49, No. 28, December 1977 (Cleveland, US) "Coldworking Boosts Fatigue Life of Fastener Holes", pages 186-187, see page 186, page 187, column 1, paragraph 1; column 2, paragraph 3 - column 3paragraph 1 | [A] - Russian Engineering Journal, Vol. 54, No. 1, 1974 (Melton Howbray, GB) L.A. BOLDIN: "Burnishing Small-Diameter Bores", pages 74-76see the entire document | [A] - Metals Abstracts, Vol. 12, April 1979, (London, GB) "The Effect of Sheet Surface Roughnesson Cold Workability", see Abstract Nr. 52-0394page 143 |