Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] |
24.10.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.12.1987 [1987/50] |
05.10.1987 | Change - applicant | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] |
09.01.1986 | Change - designated states | published on 26.02.1986 [1986/09] |
16.12.1985 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] |
30.06.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] |
30.06.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] |