EP0116583 - A REFRACTORY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1987 [1987/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORGAN REFRACTORIES LIMITED Neston South Wirral Cheshire L64 3RE / GB | [1984/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHMOND, Colin 7 Stonewalls, Rosemary Lane Burton, Rosset Clwyd / GB | 02 /
BENNET, Michael, Edward 21 Forest Road Claughton, Birkenhead Merseyside / GB | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al c/o PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902572.3 | 15.08.1983 | [1984/35] | WO1983GB00204 | Priority number, date | GB19820023995 | 20.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8223995 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400747 | Date: | 01.03.1984 | [1984/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116583 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116583 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, F27D1/16 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B35/101 (EP);
C04B35/6263 (EP);
C04B35/6316 (EP);
C04B35/66 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B38/067 (EP,US);
F27D1/10 (EP,US);
F27D1/16 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP);
C04B2235/40 (EP);
C04B2235/402 (EP);
C04B2235/448 (EP);
C04B2235/5212 (EP);
C04B2235/526 (EP);
C04B2235/5264 (EP);
C04B2235/5472 (EP);
C04B2235/94 (EP);
C04B2235/95 (EP);
F27D1/1636 (EP,US);
F27D1/1642 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/067, C04B35/00, C04B38/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | FEUERFESTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1984/35] | English: | A REFRACTORY COMPOSITION | [1984/35] | French: | COMPOSITION REFRACTAIRE | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 11.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1374910 (DE BATS JEAN HUBERT LOUIS); | [Y]FR2252312 (HO GANAS AB [SE]); | [Y]GB1541819 (TAIKO ROZAI CO LTD); | [YP]EP0082124 (HOEGANAES AB [SE]); | [YP]GB2111970 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 95, No. 16, October 1981 (Columbus, Ohio, US) Harima Refractories Co.: "Refractory Materials for Lining Vessels for Molten Metals", see page 281, column 2, Abstract No. 137213c, JP, A, 81050172 (Harima Refractories Co. Ltd) 07-05-1981 |