Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0627741B | 13.04.1994 | B2 | JPS59501873 | 08.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US8301230 | 09.08.1983 | US40632482 | 09.08.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4582809 | 15.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US38819382 | 14.06.1982 | US40632482 | 09.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8400817 | Global Dossier | 01.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40632482 | 09.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0115532 | Global Dossier | 15.08.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40632482 | 09.08.1982 |