Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3380086D1 | 20.07.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8300303 | 09.09.1983 | JP15769382 | 09.09.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8401076 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15769382 | 09.09.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0118568 | Global Dossier | 14.06.1989 | B1 | EP0118568 | 19.12.1985 | A4 | EP0118568 | 19.09.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15769382 | 09.09.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0137028B | 03.08.1989 | B2 | JPS5945781 | 14.03.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15769382 | 09.09.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4673985 | 16.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15769382 | 09.09.1982 |