EP0118568 - SEMICONDUCTOR IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISHIZAWA, Junichi 6-16, Komegafukuro 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states NISHIZAWA, Junichi 6-16, Komegafukuro 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | ||
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/23] |
Former [1984/38] | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Jun-ichi 6-16, Komegafukuro 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902905.5 | 09.09.1983 | [1984/38] | WO1983JP00303 | Priority number, date | JP19820157693 | 09.09.1982 Original published format: JP 15769382 | [1984/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401076 | Date: | 15.03.1984 | [1984/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118568 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118568 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/30 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
H01L27/14679 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1984/38] | Title | German: | HALBLEITER-BILDAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1984/38] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE | [1984/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRISE D'IMAGE A SEMICONDUCTEURS | [1984/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1984 | Translation filed | 18.05.1984 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1984 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2000908 (ZAIDAN HOJIN HANDOTAI KENKYU); | [A]JPS5515229 (HANDOTAI KENKYU SHINKOKAI); | [APD]EP0096725 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS4537728B ; | [A]JPS56150878 (HANDOTAI KENKYU SHINKOKAI) |