EP0120968 - APPARATUS FOR HEAT-VOLATILIZING MEDICINAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIHON JOCHUGIKU CO., LTD. 4-11, Tosabori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states DAINIHON JOCHUGIKU CO., LTD. 4-11, Tosabori 1-chome Ñishi-ku Osaka-shi Õsaka 550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUDA, Yoshio 10-10, Kamikoutouen 2-chome Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662 / JP | 02 /
YOSHINAGA, Sadao 22-14, Higashisugano 1-chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272 / JP | 03 /
MASHINE, Hiroyoshi 5-10, Asahicho 6-chome Souka-shi Saitama 340 / JP | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | [1984/41] | Application number, filing date | 83903108.5 | 30.09.1983 | [1984/41] | WO1983JP00323 | Priority number, date | JP19820148579U | 30.09.1982 Original published format: JP 14857982 U | JP19820148580U | 30.09.1982 Original published format: JP 14858082 U | JP19820148581U | 30.09.1982 Original published format: JP 14858182 U | JP19820174295 | 04.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17429582 | JP19820177050 | 08.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17705082 | JP19820153100U | 08.10.1982 Original published format: JP 15310082 U | JP19820169122U | 08.11.1982 Original published format: JP 16912282 U | JP19820169123U | 08.11.1982 Original published format: JP 16912382 U | JP19830000373U | 06.01.1983 Original published format: JP 37383 U | JP19830000374U | 06.01.1983 Original published format: JP 37483 U | JP19830020971U | 16.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2097183 U | JP19830177647 | 26.09.1983 Original published format: JP 17764783 | [1988/26] |
Former [1985/23] | JP19820148579U | 30.09.1982 | |
JP19820148580U | 30.09.1982 | ||
JP19820148581U | 30.09.1982 | ||
JP19820174295 | 04.10.1982 | ||
JP19820177050 | 08.10.1982 | ||
JP19820153100U | 08.10.1982 | ||
JP19820169122U | 08.11.1982 | ||
JP19820169123U | 08.11.1982 | ||
JP19830000373U | 06.01.1983 | ||
JP19830000374U | 06.01.1983 | ||
JP19830177647 | 26.09.1983 | ||
Former [1984/41] | JP19820174295 | 04.10.1982 | |
JP19820177050 | 08.10.1982 | ||
JP19830177647 | 26.09.1983 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401264 | Date: | 12.04.1984 | [1984/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120968 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120968 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01M13/00, A61L9/03 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
A01M1/2077 (EP,US);
A01N25/20 (EP,US);
A61L9/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1984/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HEISSVERFLÜCHTIGUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN AGENZ | [1984/41] | English: | APPARATUS FOR HEAT-VOLATILIZING MEDICINAL AGENT | [1984/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE VOLATILISATION THERMIQUE D'UN AGENT MEDICINAL | [1984/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1984 | Translation filed | 04.06.1984 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1984 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 20.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1366041 (KODAMA BROS CO LTD); | [A]FR2215864 (PEPRO [FR]); | [XE]FR2530144 (BERGER PRODUITS [FR]); | [A]GB2062484 (RAPPAPORT A A) | International search | JPS506912Y [ ]; | JPS432047Y [ ] |