EP0119257 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING INDEX OF REFRACTION PROFILES OF OPTICAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1984/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICE, Chester, Lamar 1460 Villa Rica Road Powder Springs, GA 30073 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1984/39] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903247.1 | 16.09.1983 | [1984/39] | WO1983US01410 | Priority number, date | US19820419645 | 17.09.1982 Original published format: US 419645 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401221 | Date: | 29.03.1984 | [1984/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119257 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/41, G01N21/84 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
G01N21/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES BRECHUNGSPROFILS OPTISCHER FASERN | [1984/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING INDEX OF REFRACTION PROFILES OF OPTICAL FIBERS | [1984/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSTIF PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LES PROFILS D'UN INDICE DE REFRACTION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.1984 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.1984 | Search fee paid | 03.05.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 16.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/15] | 20.11.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3246290 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US3578977 (NATELSON SAMUEL) | [AP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, vol. MTT-30, no. 10, October 1982, pages 1439-1454, IEEE, New York, US; W.J. STEWART: "Optical fiber and preform profiling technology" | International search | [AP]US4385832 (DOI YUZURU [JP], et al) | [Y] - Electronics Letters, Volume 16, No. 18, issued 28 August 1980 (London, England), BHAGAVATULA et al, "Refracted Power Technique for Cutoff Wavelength Measurement in Single-Mode Waveguides" | [Y] - Applied Optics, Volume 20, No. 9, issued 01 May 1981 (New York), SAUNDERS, "Optical Fiber Profiles Using the Refracted Near-Field Technique: A Comparison with other Methods" see pages 1645-1651 |