EP0122928 - METHOD FOR SAND-BLASTING BY MEANS OF WET SAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/44] | METHOD FOR SAND-BLASTING BY MEANS OF WET SAND AND SAND PROJECTION APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD | ||
[1989/01] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIZERS, Sigrid Königsbergerstrasse 2-4 D-46325 Borken / DE | [1984/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEIZERS, Josef Königsbergerstr. 2-4 D-4280 Borken / DE | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Massenbergstrasse 19-21 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | ||
Former [1990/33] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Postbox 38 28 48021 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1990/13] | Schulze Horn, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Goldstrasse 50 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1984/44] | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903384.2 | 21.10.1983 | [1984/44] | WO1983EP00273 | Priority number, date | DE19823239429 | 25.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3239429 | [1984/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401738 | Date: | 10.05.1984 | [1984/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122928 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122928 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B24C7/00 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
B24C7/0038 (EP);
B24C1/08 (KR);
B24C5/04 (EP);
B24C7/0007 (EP);
B24C7/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SANDSTRAHLEN MIT FEUCHTSAND | [1989/01] | English: | METHOD FOR SAND-BLASTING BY MEANS OF WET SAND | [1989/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE SABLAGE AU MOYEN DE SABLE HUMIDE | [1989/01] |
Former [1984/44] | VERFAHREN ZUM SANDSTRAHLEN MIT FEUCHTSAND SOWIE SANDSTRAHLGERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [1984/44] | METHOD FOR SAND-BLASTING BY MEANS OF WET SAND AND SAND PROJECTION APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD | ||
Former [1984/44] | PROCEDE DE SABLAGE AU MOYEN DE SABLE HUMIDE ET APPAREIL DE PROJECTION DE SABLE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1984 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE ARBEX Oberflächentechnik GmbH Dorfstrasse 37 D-24340 Windeby / DE Opponent's representative Tönnies, Jan G. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwàlte Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE ARBEX Oberflächentechnik GmbH Dorfstrasse 37 D-24340 Windeby / DE Opponent's representative Tönnies, Jan G., Dipl.-Ing. Niemannsweg 133 D-24105 Kiel / DE | 13.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.04.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.07.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/48] | Appeal following opposition | 06.02.1992 | Appeal received No. T0205/92 | 27.02.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 04.01.1989 | |
LI | 04.01.1989 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE535287 (BADISCHE MASCHF GMBH, et al); | [A]FR1080033 (MARIBLAST CORP); | [A]DE1268514 (VACU BLAST LTD); | [Y]DE1809677 (WOMA APPBAU W MAASBERG & CO GM); | [Y]DE1809678 (WOMA APPBAU W MAASBERG & CO GM); | [Y]EP0025156 (MYERS EUROP PUMPEN GMBH [DE]) |