EP0163630 - ANGLING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTACK EQUIPMENT Churchill Works Clee's Hall Bures Suffolk CO8 5DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states PROTACK EQUIPMENT Churchill Works Clee's Hall Bures Suffolk CO8 5DZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMMINGS, Barry, Edward 35 Magnolia Way Pilgrims Hatch Brentwood Essex CM15 9QS / GB | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 83903562.3 | 14.11.1983 | [1985/50] | WO1983GB00286 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502091 | Date: | 23.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163630 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01K97/10 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
A01K97/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | HILFSMITTEL ZUM ANGELN | [1985/50] | English: | ANGLING AID | [1985/50] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE PECHE A LA LIGNE | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/19] | 02.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.08.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 15.08.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.11.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2696899 ; | [X]GB581392 ; | [X]US2954909 ; | [X]US2742211 ; | [X]US1761497 |