EP0125272 - DEVICE BY A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMACO I HALMSTAD AKTIEBOLAG Ryttarevägen 10 302 55 Halmstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states PROMACO I HALMSTAD AKTIEBOLAG Ryttarevägen 10 S-302 55 Halmstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARVIDSSON, Kjell Sörenstigen 8 S-302 40 Halmstad / SE | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Magnusson, Gustav L.A. Groth & Co. Box 6153 200 11 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Magnusson, Gustav MAGNUPATENT AB P.O. Box 6207 S-200 11 Malmö 6 / SE | Application number, filing date | 83903596.1 | 26.10.1983 | [1984/47] | WO1983SE00365 | Priority number, date | SE19820006196 | 01.11.1982 Original published format: SE 8206196 | [1984/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401795 | Date: | 10.05.1984 | [1984/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125272 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/74, // E04C2/46, F24F5/00 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
E04C2/523 (EP);
E04B1/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | WANDANORDNUNG | [1984/47] | English: | DEVICE BY A WALL | [1984/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PAROI | [1984/47] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1984 | Translation filed | 16.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 21.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.05.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/46] | 10.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR952249 [ ]; | DE1941401 [ ] (BECKER OTTO ALFRED DR); | DE2348253 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US4103598 [ ] (COOPER KENNETH R); | DE2725679 [ ] (SAUER KLEMENS DIPL ING); | DE3037871 [ ] (GAVIOLI GABRIELE) |