EP0140893 - SELF-LIMITING HEATER AND RESISTANCE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1989 [1989/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRONNVALL, Wolfgang Jordbogatan 10 S-252 60 Helsingborg / SE | [1985/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Halldin, Bo, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Halldin, Bo, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 S-104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83903611.8 | 08.11.1983 | [1985/20] | WO1983SE00382 | Priority number, date | SE19820006442 | 12.11.1982 Original published format: SE 8206442 | [1985/20] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402048 | Date: | 24.05.1984 | [1984/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140893 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140893 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0140893 | Date: | 17.01.1989 | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/12, H05B3/56, H01C7/02 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
H01C7/028 (EP,US);
H05B3/146 (EP,US);
H05B3/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/20] | Title | German: | SELBSTBEGRENZENDER ERHITZER UND WIDERSTANDSMATERIAL | [1988/43] | English: | SELF-LIMITING HEATER AND RESISTANCE MATERIAL | [1985/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE AUTOREGULATEUR ET MATERIAU DE RESISTANCE | [1985/20] |
Former [1985/20] | SELBSTBESCHRÄNKENDER ERHITZER UND WIDERSTANDSMATERIAL | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1984 | Translation filed | 03.12.1984 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1984 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 05.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2634931 [ ] (RAYCHEM CORP); | GB675752 [ ] (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | SE85642 [ ]; | DE2103319 [ ] | Examination | US3243753 | US3673121 |