Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0160642
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.12.1989 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] |
24.12.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.02.1989 [1989/06] |
26.10.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.12.1988 [1988/50] |
25.10.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.12.1988 [1988/50] |
01.10.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] |
19.05.1987 |
First examination report |
|
04.03.1986 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] |
14.09.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] |
14.09.1985 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] |