Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8501734 | Global Dossier | 25.04.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0160642 | Global Dossier | 08.02.1989 | B1 | EP0160642 | 04.03.1986 | A4 | EP0160642 | 13.11.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1244437 | 08.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3379171D1 | 16.03.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61500172 | 30.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4480084 | 30.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US55332183 | 13.10.1983 | US8301597 | 13.10.1983 |