EP0130994 - END CLOSURE FOR TUBULAR HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER TRAVENOL LABORATORIES, INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [1985/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOBIASZ, Henry, E. 1214 East Campbell Avenue Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, et al Klunker IP Patenanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/03] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903694.4 | 17.10.1983 | [1985/03] | WO1983US01628 | Priority number, date | US19820451111 | 20.12.1982 Original published format: US 451111 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402478 | Date: | 05.07.1984 | [1984/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130994 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130994 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/01 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
F28F21/067 (EP);
B01D63/031 (EP,US);
B01D63/021 (EP,US);
B29C65/00 (EP);
B29C66/1162 (EP);
B29C66/5344 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1985/03] | B01D31/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/03] | Title | German: | ENDVERSCHLUSS FÜR ROHRFÖRMIGES GEHÄUSE | [1985/03] | English: | END CLOSURE FOR TUBULAR HOUSING | [1985/03] | French: | FERMETURE TERMINALE POUR BOITIER TUBULAIRE | [1985/03] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1984 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1984 | Search fee paid | 17.08.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 02.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 04.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP58122821 ; | [X]US3344010 (FRANZ NORMAN J); | [A]FR2267138 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]); | [Y]FR2456524 (CORDIS DOW CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0058275 (SENKO MED INSTR MFG [JP]) | International search | [Y]US4218313 (AID JAMES D [US], et al); | [Y]US4271014 (AID JAMES D, et al); | [A]US4283284 (SCHNELL WILLIAM J); | [XE]US4414110 (GEEL ZANE H [US], et al) | Examination | WO8002805 |