EP0127647 - PROJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sacher, Friedrich Josef Agnesstrasse 52a D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | [1986/51] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states Sacher, Brigitte Stationsweg 24 D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/36] |
Former [1984/50] | 01 /
SACHER, Friedrich-Josef Stationsweg 24 D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Freischem, Werner Patentanwälte Freischem Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Freischem, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Freischem, An Gross St. Martin 2 D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903788.4 | 29.11.1983 | [1984/50] | WO1983EP00318 | Priority number, date | DE19823244394 | 01.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3244394 | [1984/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402200 | Date: | 07.06.1984 | [1984/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127647 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127647 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G03B23/18, G03B23/10 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G03B23/105 (EP,US);
G03B23/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/50] | G03B23/16, G03B23/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSGERÄT | [1984/50] | English: | PROJECTOR | [1984/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE PROJECTION | [1984/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.1986 | 30.11.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.09.1987 | SE | 30.09.1987 | [2015/21] |
Former [1990/32] | NL | 02.09.1987 | |
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
GB | 29.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/31] | NL | 02.09.1987 | |
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
GB | 29.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/19] | NL | 02.09.1987 | |
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/05] | NL | 02.09.1987 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3036496 (FREDERICK JR CLAUDE M, et al); | [A]FR1423058 ; | [A]CH486716 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]BE761744 (SNAM PROGETTI); | [A]FR2365140 (PRICE KAREN [FR]); | [A]EP0032438 (TECHNICARE CORP [US]) |