Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0127647
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
22.06.1990 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] |
14.06.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
22.03.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] |
15.12.1988 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
04.07.1988 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] |
18.07.1987 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] |
31.10.1986 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] |
31.10.1986 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] |
31.10.1986 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] |
18.12.1984 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.1985 [1985/08] |
15.10.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.1984 [1984/50] |