EP0125297 - OPEN LOOP WITH GRIPPING AREA FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.1985 [1985/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LESTER, Jess C. Suite 818 478 Peachtree Street N.E. Atlanta, GA 30308 / US | [1984/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/47] | Application number, filing date | 83903875.9 | 07.11.1983 | [1984/47] | WO1983US01754 | Priority number, date | US19820440038 | 08.11.1982 Original published format: US 440038 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401709 | Date: | 10.05.1984 | [1984/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125297 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/47] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61F1/16, A61F1/00 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
A61F2/16 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1681 (US);
A61F2002/1683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | OFFENE SCHLEIFE MIT BEFESTIGUNGSZONE FÜR AUGENLINSEN | [1984/47] | English: | OPEN LOOP WITH GRIPPING AREA FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS | [1984/47] | French: | BOUCLE OUVERTE AVEC ZONE D'ACCROCHAGE POUR LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES | [1984/47] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/20] | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.1984 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4014049 (RICHARDS WILLIAM, et al); | [Y]US4134160 (BAYERS JON H); | [X]US4249271 (POLER STANLEY [US]); | [X]US4298995 (POLER STANLEY) | [X] - Intermedics Intraocular, Inc., P.O. Box 70670, Pasadena, CA, Advertisement Model 045 Posterior Chamber Lens, issued April 1982. |