EP0114056 - Sample stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouchée, Bernhard Berliner Platz 9 D-6239 Kriftel / DE | [1984/30] | Application number, filing date | 84100172.0 | 10.01.1984 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | DE19830000950U | 15.01.1983 Original published format: DE 8300950 U | [1984/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114056 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114056 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114056 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/00, B01L3/14, B01L9/06, B01L3/00 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
B01L3/50855 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/30] | G01N1/00, B01L3/14, B01L9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/30] | Title | German: | Probensammler | [1984/30] | English: | Sample stand | [1984/30] | French: | Porte-éprouvettes | [1984/30] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 09.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2110030 (ASTEC INC); | [A]DE2117279 ; | [A]US3785773 (ROHRBAUGH D); | [A]GB1392792 (SUOVANIEMI OSMO ANTERO); | [A]US3905772 (HARTNETT JOHN J, et al) |