EP0120190 - Control device for a vehicle driven by an engine via a transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/40] | Vehicle control device for regulating the available power when changing gears | ||
[1987/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100352.8 | 14.01.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833311254 | 28.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311254 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120190 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120190 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120190 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/06 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP);
F16H59/14 (EP);
F16H2059/142 (EP);
F16H59/48 (EP);
F16H59/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Kontrolleinrichtung für ein von einem Motor über ein Getriebe angetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1987/31] | English: | Control device for a vehicle driven by an engine via a transmission | [1987/31] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un véhicule propulsé par un moteur via une boîte de vitesse | [1987/31] |
Former [1984/40] | Kontrolleinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug zur Steuerung der zur Verfügung stehenden Leistung bei Änderung der Getriebeübersetzung | ||
Former [1984/40] | Vehicle control device for regulating the available power when changing gears | ||
Former [1984/40] | Dispositif de commande d'un véhicule pour maximiser la performance disponible en changeant la vitesse de transmission | Examination procedure | 16.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 18.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0007881 [ ] (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]); | DE2836082 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | FR2435635 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | DE2852195 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | GB2053387 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR); | DE3018032 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | DE3101056 [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | DE3240236 [ ] (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD [JP]); | DE3246201 [ ] (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) |