|
10.01.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.1992 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.10.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.03.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1991 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1991 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.1990 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.02.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
18.05.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1984 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |