Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0123781
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
07.03.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
30.12.1993 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |
09.04.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] |
12.02.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] |
07.03.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] |
11.01.1991 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
11.01.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
02.01.1990 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.02.1990 [1990/08] |
04.02.1989 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] |
02.11.1987 |
First examination report |
|
13.03.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] |
18.02.1986 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.04.1986 [1986/15] |
11.02.1986 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |
07.09.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] |