Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3477431D1 | 27.04.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3311307 | 28.03.1983 | DE3477431 | 14.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0123781 | Global Dossier | 16.02.1994 | B2 | EP0123781 | 22.03.1989 | B1 | EP0123781 | 02.04.1986 | A3 | EP0123781 | 07.11.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3311307 | 28.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3311307 | 11.10.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3311307 | 28.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59179441 | 12.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3311307 | 28.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4574924 | 11.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3311307 | 28.03.1983 |