Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] |
19.08.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] |
29.03.1988 | First examination report | |
04.06.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] |
20.06.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.08.1984 [1984/34] |
26.05.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] |